URI(s)
Identifies LC/NAF RWO
Identifies RWO
Birth Date
- 1871-11-12
Death Date
- 1947-02-23
Has Affiliation
- Affiliation Start: 1915-03-04
- Affiliation End: 1937-01-03
- Organization: United States. Congress. House
Has Affiliation
- Organization: Beeson College (Arcadia, La.)
Has Affiliation
- Affiliation End: 1894
- Organization: Iuka Normal Institute (Miss.)
Has Affiliation
- Affiliation Start: 1895
- Affiliation End: 1897
- Organization: Harrisonburg High School
Birth Place
- Louisiana
Occupation
Legislator
Principal
Judge
Exact Matching Concepts from Other Schemes
Closely Matching Concepts from Other Schemes
Sources
- found: NUCMC data from Library of Congress Manuscript Division for Newell, F. Papers, 1885-1931(Wilson, Riley Joseph; b. 1871; d. 1947)
- found: Bio. dir. U.S. Cong., 1989(Wilson, Riley Joseph; d. 1946; U.S. rep. from La., 1915-1937)
- found: NYT obit., Feb. 25, 1947(Riley Joseph Wilson; La. congressman; d. Feb. 23, 1947, at age 74 of heart attack)
- found: Biog. dir. of the U.S. Congress, viewed online, Sept. 6, 2017(WILSON, Riley Joseph, a Representative from Louisiana; born near Goldonna, Winn Parish, La., Nov. 12, 1871; attended the public schools and Beeson College, Arcadia, La.; was graduated from Iuka (Miss.) Normal Institute in 1894; principal of Harrisonburg High School 1895-1897; studied law; was admitted to the bar in 1898 and commenced practice in Harrisonburg, La.; member of the State constitutional convention in 1898; edited the Catahoula News 1898-1904; member of the State house of representatives 1900-1904; district attorney of the eighth judicial district from Dec. 1, 1904, until his resignation on May 1, 1910, to accept a judicial appointment; judge of the eighth judicial district from May 1, 1910, until his resignation on Dec. 1, 1914, having been elected to Congress; delegate to the Democratic National Convention in 1920; elected as a Democrat to the Sixty-fourth and to the ten succeeding Congresses (March 4, 1915-January 3, 1937); chairman, Committee on Elections No. 1 (Sixty-fifth Congress), Committee on Flood Control (Seventy-second through Seventy-fourth Congresses); unsuccessful candidate for renomination in 1936; unsuccessful candidate for Governor in 1928; retired from public and political activities; died in Ruston, La., Feb. 23, 1946)
Instance Of
Scheme Membership(s)
Collection Membership(s)
Change Notes
- 1998-03-24: new
- 2017-09-06: revised
Alternate Formats